AB149
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 20, 2013.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions concerning persons legally responsible for the psychiatric care of a child who is in the custody of an agency which provides child welfare services. (BDR 38-505)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 18, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 04, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 20, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 21, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)