SB173
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Denis, Woodhouse, Jones, Dondero Loop, Kirkpatrick

Makes appropriations to the Knowledge Fund. (BDR S-534)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Feb 22, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 19, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 27, 2013

  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)