AB155
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 20, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Eisen, Frierson, Benitez-Thompson, Carrillo, Dondero Loop, Duncan, Flores, Healey, Kirkpatrick, Oscarson, Jones, Hardy

Revises provisions governing reports of the abuse or neglect of a child. (BDR 38-610)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 13, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 01, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 25, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 14, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 115   

Bill History

Feb 20, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 21, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 115.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.