SB182
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 21, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Woodhouse, Denis, Jones, Ford, Atkinson, Kihuen, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Spearman, Kirkpatrick, Dondero Loop, Bobzien, Horne, Sprinkle, Elliot Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Daly, Diaz, Eisen, Healey, Spiegel

Expands full-day kindergarten in public schools. (BDR 34-138)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 25, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Feb 25, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Heard in joint hearing, no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 289   

Bill History

Feb 21, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 22, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 289.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)