AB161
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 21, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing the advancement of certain pupils to higher grade levels. (BDR 34-722)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 21, 2013     12:22 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Feb 27, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     Feb 27, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 262   

Bill History

Feb 21, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 22, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 262.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)