AB162
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 21, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing class-size reduction. (BDR 34-724)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 21, 2013     12:22 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Feb 27, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     Feb 27, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 20, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2013     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 263     Amend. No. 983   

Bill History

Feb 21, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 22, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 263.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 983.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)