AB164
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 25, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirner, Hickey, Duncan, Fiore, Grady, Hambrick, Healey, Kirkpatrick, Munford, Stewart, Hammond, Kieckhefer

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-410)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)