AB167
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 25, 2013.
By: Transportation

Establishes requirements for the permitting of certain vehicles that are driven in Nevada and owned by a nonresident business. (BDR 43-708)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 21, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 14, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 09, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Transportation     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 318     Amend. No. 572   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 26, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 318.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 572.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 01, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Jun 02, 2013

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.
  • Effective June 11, 2013, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on January 1, 2014, for all other purposes.