SB205
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Kihuen, Parks, Segerblom, Atkinson, Manendo

Makes various changes concerning the collection of information relating to the treatment of trauma. (BDR 40-698)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 11, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended   Re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 363   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 04, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 363.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)