SB206
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 01, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford, Kihuen, Denis, Jones, Smith, Atkinson, Cegavske, Parks, Settelmeyer, Spearman, Woodhouse, Spiegel, Frierson, Healey, Bustamante Adams, Duncan

Revises provisions relating to food establishments. (BDR 40-935)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 19, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 20, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 26, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 09, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 13, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 87   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 04, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.