SB207
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-196)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 20, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 05, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)