AB205
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 05, 2013.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-200)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 04, 2013     03:31 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar 27, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 01, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     May 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Education     May 16, 2013     12:46 PM          Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-10-13   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
May 31, 2013 06: 00 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 265     Amend. No. 612     Amend. No. CA2   

Bill History

Mar 05, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 06, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 265.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 24, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 612.) To printer.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2013

  • Senate Amendment No. 612 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 612 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 612 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 05, 2013

  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
  • Sections 1 to 5, inclusive, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 20.5, and 21 of this act effective June 11, 2013. Sections 5.5, 8.5, 10.5, 12.5, 14.5, 15.5, 16.5, 18.5, 19.5, and 19.7 effective January 1, 2020. Section 11.5 of this act effective July 1, 2020.