AB222
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 08, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz, Bustamante Adams, Flores, Neal, Carrillo, Benitez-Thompson, Denis, Kihuen, Segerblom

Requires certain school districts to adopt pilot programs for the establishment of reading skills development centers. (BDR S-482)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 22, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Finance     Apr 25, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 08, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 11, 2013

  • From printer. To committees.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2013

  • From Concurrent Committee on Education: Do pass.
  • Exemption effective.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)