AB224
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 08, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Elliot Anderson, Bustamante Adams, Dondero Loop, Woodhouse, Spearman, Parks, Atkinson

Revises provisions governing the collection and maintenance of certain data relating to public education. (BDR 34-269)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 20, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 112   

Bill History

Mar 08, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 11, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 112.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 08, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 28, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 29, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2013

May 31, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 05, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.
  • Sections 2 and 3 of this act effective June 10, 2013. Section 1 of this act effective July 1, 2014.