SB240
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 12, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Denis, Woodhouse, Hardy, Hutchison, Brower, Kieckhefer, Kihuen, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Hickey, Bobzien, Hardy, Horne, Oscarson, Spiegel, Stewart, Swank

Authorizes the reimbursement of teachers for certain out-of-pocket expenses. (BDR 34-651)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 12, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 13, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Without recommendation.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)