SB241
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 12, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Roberson, Hutchison, Hammond, Gustavson, Brower, Goicoechea, Hardy, Kieckhefer, Settelmeyer, Duncan, Fiore, Hickey, Paul Anderson, Ellison, Grady, Hambrick, Hansen, Hardy, Kirner, Livermore, Oscarson, Stewart, Wheeler, Woodbury

Establishes a tax credit for donations to a school tuition organization. (BDR 34-87)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 12, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 13, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)