AB259
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2013.
By: Ways and Means

Revises provisions governing the P-16 Advisory Council. (BDR 34-198)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 13, 2013     11:20 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 271   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 14, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 271.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 19, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 24, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.
  • Sections 3 and 4 of this act effective May 24, 2013. Sections 1 and 2 of this act effective July 1, 2013.