AB260
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Elliot Anderson, Bustamante Adams, Spearman

Revises provisions governing tuition charges assessed against certain students within the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-226)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 20, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Finance     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 114     Amend. No. 971   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 14, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 04, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 114.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 08, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 28, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 29, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2013

May 31, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 971.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 971 concurred in.

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.