AB261
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson

Revises provisions governing the crime of sexual conduct between certain school employees or volunteers at a school and a pupil. (BDR 15-521)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 02, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)