AB272
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Elliot Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Dondero Loop, Flores, Frierson, Munford, Neal, Pierce, Swank

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-791)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 266   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)