AB278
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford, Diaz, Elliot Anderson, Paul Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Cohen, Daly, Eisen, Fiore, Healey, Hickey, Hogan, Kirkpatrick, Martin, Neal, Ohrenschall, Stewart, Swank, Segerblom, Spearman, Goicoechea, Manendo, Parks, Woodhouse

Enacts provisions related to multicultural education. (BDR 34-512)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)