AB288
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Flores, Dondero Loop, Kirner, Elliot Anderson

Revises provisions governing graduation from high school. (BDR 34-524)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 267     Amend. No. 671     Amend. No. 949   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 267.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 24, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 671 and 949 concurred in.

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.
  • Sections 43.5 to 44.7, inclusive, and 45 of this act effective June 11, 2013. Sections 1 to 43, inclusive, of this act effective July 1, 2013.