SB267
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Spearman, Parks, Ford, Segerblom

Establishes provisions governing tanning establishments. (BDR 52-958)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 407.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 27, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 17, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 25,   Nay 16,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 487   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 487.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 407.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.