SB269
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford, Atkinson, Woodhouse, Kihuen, Cegavske, Jones, Manendo, Spearman, Frierson, Healey, Spiegel

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-892)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 428.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 25, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 287     Amend. No. 834   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 287.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 23, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 834.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 834 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 428.
  • Effective January 1, 2015.