SB283
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 15, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Hutchison, Cegavske, Gustavson

Revises provisions relating to the Commission on Ethics. (BDR 23-103)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 04, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 14, 2013     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 513   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 18, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 513.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)