SB291
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Brower, Hardy, Hutchison, Kieckhefer, Denis, Hammond

Requires the board of trustees of certain school districts to establish a prekindergarten program to teach children who are limited English proficient. (BDR 34-857)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Without recommendation.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)