SB293
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith

Makes an appropriation to the Trust Account for the Education of Dependent Children. (BDR S-140)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 02, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.