SB303
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis, Kihuen, Roberson, Ford, Segerblom, Atkinson, Hammond, Hardy, Hutchison, Jones, Manendo, Parks, Smith, Spearman, Woodhouse, Bustamante Adams, Diaz, Flores, Elliot Anderson, Spiegel, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Bobzien, Dondero Loop, Eisen, Frierson, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Munford, Neal, Pierce

Provides for the issuance of driver authorization cards. (BDR 43-596)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 282.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 03, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 04, 2013     02:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 18, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 23, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 25, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 27, 2013   Yea 30,   Nay 9,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 421     Amend. No. 714   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 421.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2013

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 714.) To printer.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 25, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 27, 2013

May 28, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 282.
  • Section 13 effective May 31, 2013. Section 12 effective July 1, 2013. Sections 1 to 11, inclusive, of this act become effective May 31, 2013, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2014, for all other purposes.