SB305
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-694)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 233.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 02, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 06, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 13, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 293     Amend. No. 609   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Education.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 293.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.) To printer.

May 18, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 24, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 609 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 233.
  • Effective May 28, 2013, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes.