SB311
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford

Revises provisions governing empowerment schools. (BDR 34-637)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 08, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 17,   Nay 24,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 448     Amend. No. 786   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 448.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 25, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 24, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 786.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 24, Excused: 1.)

May 25, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)