AB328
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Elliot Anderson

Revises the calculation of the basic support guarantee for school districts to include an additional percentage for pupils who are limited English proficient. (BDR 34-725)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)