SB314
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis

Provides that the right of parents to make choices regarding the care, custody and management of their children is a fundamental right. (BDR 11-880)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 408.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 09, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 747   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 747.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 747 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 408.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.