AB337
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Encourages public schools to establish and participate in programs that promote the consumption of fresh fruits and vegetables by children. (BDR S-45)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 170.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 16, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 21, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

May 22, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 170.
  • Effective May 27, 2013.