SB320
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Denis

Revises provisions governing medical care in schools. (BDR 34-831)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 27, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 31, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 292     Amend. No. 848   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 292.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 30, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 848.) To printer.

May 31, 2013

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)