SB328
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Grady, Hickey, Kirkpatrick

Makes various changes relating to education. (BDR 34-937)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 21, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Jun 01, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 545     Amend. No. 905   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 545.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 29, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 905.) To printer.

May 30, 2013

May 31, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.