AB348
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson, Spiegel, Carrillo, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Cohen, Fiore

Revises provisions relating to foster care. (BDR 38-457)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 306.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 18, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 18, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 25, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 02, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 16, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 386     Amend. No. 694     Amend. No. 839   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 24, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 694.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2013

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 839.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 27, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2013

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 694 and 839 concurred in.

May 29, 2013

  • To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 306.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.