AB356
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Livermore, Hickey, Ellison, Grady, Hansen, Hardy, Healey, Oscarson, Swank, Woodbury

Encourages the development of recommendations to preserve the Nevada State Prison for historic and certain other purposes. (BDR S-493)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 29, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 06, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 13, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 283   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 283.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

Apr 18, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 07, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 13, 2013

May 14, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.