AB357
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien

Revises provisions governing the regional training programs for the professional development of teachers and administrators. (BDR 34-272)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Apr 05, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 512   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 512.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 19, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)