SB338
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Hutchison, Denis, Spearman, Segerblom, Atkinson, Brower, Ford, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Hammond, Hardy, Jones, Kieckhefer, Kihuen, Manendo, Parks, Roberson, Settelmeyer, Smith, Woodhouse, Fiore, Carrillo, Grady, Hickey, Kirkpatrick

Changes the term “mental retardation” to “intellectual disability” in NRS. (BDR 39-52)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 186.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 02, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 10, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 160   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 160.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 186.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.