SB343
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea, Gustavson, Settelmeyer, Ellison, Grady, Oscarson

Makes various changes relating to off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-630)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 188.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 01, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 09, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 243   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 243.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 14, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 188.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.