SB344
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Smith, Denis, Spearman, Parks, Ford, Jones, Kihuen, Segerblom

Revises provisions relating to the education of certain children who are patients or residents of certain hospitals or facilities. (BDR 34-933)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 234.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 08, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 211   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 211.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

Apr 18, 2013

  • In Assembly.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 14, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 234.
  • Effective May 28, 2013, for the purposes of entering into cooperative agreements pursuant to section 2 of this act, adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes.