SB345
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse, Parks, Ford, Denis, Smith, Jones, Kihuen, Manendo, Segerblom, Spearman, Dondero Loop, Swank

Creates the Advisory Council on Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics. (BDR S-700)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 235.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr 29, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 13, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 450     Amend. No. 610   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 450.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

Apr 18, 2013

  • In Assembly.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer.

May 17, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 24, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 610 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 235.
  • Effective July 1, 2013. Sections 1 and 2 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2017.