SB350
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hutchison, Roberson

Revises provisions relating to the issuance of general obligations by school districts. (BDR 34-1059)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 189.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 01, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 233   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 233.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 189.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.