SB357
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Smith, Atkinson, Neal, Stewart, Hambrick

Provides for tax credits for certain business entities. (BDR 18-478)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 532.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 06, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 21, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 954   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 02, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 954.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 06, 2013

  • In Senate.

Jun 11, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 12, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 532.
  • Effective June 12, 2013, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and October 1, 2013, for all other purposes.