AB373
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Duncan, Hickey, Hardy, Paul Anderson, Fiore, Hambrick, Livermore

Establishes a tax credit for donations to a school tuition organization. (BDR 34-716)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 08, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 09, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Taxation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From Concurrent Committee on Education: Without recommendation.
  • Action of concurrent referral to Committee on Taxation rescinded.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)