SB31
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2012.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing children within the jurisdiction of the juvenile court and children in protective custody. (BDR 5-385)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 155.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 18, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     May 01, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 13, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 20, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 189     Amend. No. 659   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2012

  • Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Feb 27, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 189.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 659.) To printer.

May 20, 2013

May 21, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 659 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 155.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.