AB376
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Dondero Loop, Diaz, Kirkpatrick, Elliot Anderson, Bobzien, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Carrillo, Eisen, Frierson, Spiegel, Swank, Woodhouse

Authorizes the reimbursement of teachers for certain out-of-pocket expenses. (BDR 34-774)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 25, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)