AB377
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Dondero Loop, Frierson, Aizley, Carrillo, Diaz, Eisen, Spiegel, Woodhouse

Revises provisions governing the crime of sexual conduct between certain school employees or volunteers at a school and pupils. (BDR 15-514)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 387.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 02, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 11, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     May 02, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 13, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 16, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 167     Amend. No. 828   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 828.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2013

  • Senate Amendment No. 828 concurred in.

Jun 01, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 387.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.