AB393
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Fiore, Kirkpatrick, Hambrick, Aizley, Elliot Anderson, Paul Anderson, Bobzien, Bustamante Adams, Cohen, Diaz, Ellison, Frierson, Hansen, Healey, Hickey, Kirner, Livermore, Martin, Ohrenschall, Oscarson, Spiegel, Stewart, Swank, Wheeler, Woodbury, Segerblom, Gustavson

Expands the rights of children placed in foster care. (BDR 38-919)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 02, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 16, 2013     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 16, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 300   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 300.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2013

Apr 17, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2013

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 210.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.