AB402
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hogan, Martin, Swank

Provides for the legalization and taxation of marijuana. (BDR 15-1069)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)